Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John White

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1554¹SelectedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
1 Apr 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 1554ConfirmedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 1556AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
12 Jan 1560DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John White:
Bishop John White (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 225, and Page 335
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 17
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013