Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Brooks

Deceased

Bishop of Gloucester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1512¹Born
1 Apr 155442.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gloucester, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 155442.5ConfirmedBishop of Gloucester, England, Great Britain
7 Sep 155846.6DiedBishop of Gloucester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Brooks (VIAF: 54493353)
Bishop James Brooks (born 1512, died ) Bishop of Gloucester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSauveur, Chapel, Southwark, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 5
  • b/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Oct 2017