Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Gardiner

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497BornBury St. Edmunds
20 Oct 153134.8AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
3 Dec 153134.9Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
1550²53.0ResignedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
1553²56.0AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
12 Nov 155558.9DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Gardiner:
Bishop Stephen Gardiner (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 23.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 335
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013