Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Reginald Cardinal Pole

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1500Born
1536²35.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 153636.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 153736.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
3 May 154040.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
10 Dec 154040.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
1 Dec 155555.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
11 Dec 155555.7AppointedAdministrator of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
1556¹55.8AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 155656.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 155656.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 155858.7DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Reginald Pole (VIAF: 37029945)
Reginald Cardinal Pole (born , died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStourton Castle, Staffordshire, England
Ordained BishopGreyfriars, Greenwich
Death PlaceLambeth Palace, London, Diocese of London, England
Buried Place (Original)Becket's Corona, Cathedral, Canterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a priest for 2.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
  • a cardinal for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 25
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Oct 2017