Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Morgan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Mar 1554SelectedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
1 Apr 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
6 Jul 1554ConfirmedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
Jun 1559²ResignedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
23 Dec 1559DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henry Morgan
Bishop Henry Morgan (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint David’s

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSauveur, Chapel, Southwark, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast