Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert Bourne

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Mar 1554SelectedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
1 Apr 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 1554ConfirmedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 1569DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Bourne
Bishop Gilbert Bourne (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSauveur, Chapel, Southwark, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 144
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 130
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast