Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Rolla

Deceased

Bishop of Forli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1877BornCrema
4 Aug 190123.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 193255.1AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
8 Jan 193355.3Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
2 Aug 195072.8DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rolla:
Bishop Giuseppe Rolla (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013