Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandre-Joseph-Charles Derouineau, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kunming [Kunming], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1898Born
192122.9ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 May 192325.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Dec 192325.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
8 Dec 194345.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yünnanfu, China
8 Dec 194345.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
19 Mar 194446.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
11 Apr 194648.2AppointedArchbishop of Kunming [Kunming], China
30 Sep 197375.7DiedArchbishop of Kunming [Kunming], China

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Joseph-Charles Derouineau (VIAF: 7383670)
Archbishop Alexandre-Joseph-Charles Derouineau M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Kunming [Kunming]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlaison, Diocese of Angers, France
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopKweiyang
Death PlaceGohier, Diocese of Angers, France

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 7
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Jul 2018

Quantcast