Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stjepan Blasković, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Makarska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1689³BornSolta
12 Mar 171223.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
17 Dec 171223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
24 Sep 173142.7AppointedBishop of Makarska, Croatia
10 Feb 173243.1Ordained BishopBishop of Makarska, Croatia
Nov 1776³87.8DiedBishop of Makarska, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stjepan Blasković:
Bishop Stjepan Blasković C.O. (born , died Nov 1776) Bishop of Makarska

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015