Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Maria Suárez

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1690Born
16 Aug 171625.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 172433.6AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
9 Jul 172433.6Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
20 Nov 174757.0AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
19 Jun 175059.6DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maria Suárez
Bishop Pietro Maria Suárez (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 199
  • c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 66
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast