Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Baselios Bistauros

Deceased

Bishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1879BornTahta
9 May 190323.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 192646.8AppointedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
30 Nov 192647.1Ordained BishopBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
30 Nov 193455.1DiedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for François Baselios Bistauros:
Bishop François Baselios Bistauros (born , died ) Bishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh}

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,898
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013