Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Biancheri, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Lagania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1804Born
28 Jan 185348.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia
28 Jan 185348.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
2 Oct 185348.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania
31 Jul 186055.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia
11 Sep 186459.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Biancheri (VIAF: 88760726)
Bishop Lorenzo Biancheri C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorghetto San Nicolò, Diocese of Ventimiglia, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 337
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast