Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeu Bezerra Bessa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1923Born
11 Dec 194926.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 197349.1AppointedBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
1 May 197349.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
18 May 199470.5ResignedBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
23 Jul 200076.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pompeu Bezerra Bessa
Bishop Pompeu Bezerra Bessa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlto Santo

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast