Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico de Dominis (Dominicis)

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1828Born
5 Apr 185123.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 188456.7AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
16 Nov 188456.7Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
21 May 189466.2AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
17 Jun 190880.3DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico de Dominis (Dominicis)
Archbishop Enrico de Dominis (Dominicis) (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvellino, Diocese of Avellino
Ordained BishopSant’Apollinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 92, and Page 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast