Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Szily

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1735³Born
17 Dec 175722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Győr (Raab), Hungary
3 Sep 175823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
6 Mar 177539.5SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
24 Apr 177539.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
24 Apr 177539.6AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
28 May 177539.7Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
17 Feb 177741.4SelectedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
23 Jun 177741.8ConfirmedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
2 Jan 179963.3DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Szily
Bishop János Szily (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUjkerien

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361, and Page 408
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast