Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Inocencio Bejarano

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1750BornGranada, Spain
3 Jul 179746.9SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
18 Dec 179747.3ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
17 Jun 179847.8Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
23 Feb 180150.5AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
13 Dec 181868.3DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Inocencio Bejarano
Bishop Pedro Inocencio Bejarano (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 341
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 117, Number 615
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016