Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Pietro Barbarigo

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1671³Born
17 Mar 169624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
25 Jun 170635.0AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
5 Sep 170635.2Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
1 May 172553.8DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Barbarigo
Patriarch Pietro Barbarigo (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 409
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast