Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
29 Apr 1592 | Born | ||
19 Jan 1626 | 33.7 | Appointed | Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy |
18 Apr 1644 | 51.9 | Appointed | Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy |
Mar 1659³ | 66.8 | Died | Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Brescia, Diocese of Brescia |
|
|
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022 Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022 |
✠