Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Arundel

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Aug 1373AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
9 Apr 1374Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 1388AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 1396AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
19 Feb 1414DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Arundel:
Archbishop Thomas Arundel (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 163, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 233
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 21, and Page 336
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 80
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013