Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Courtenay

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jun 1413AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
17 Sep 1413Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
15 Sep 1415DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Courtenay:
Bishop Richard Courtenay (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 466
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 371
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013