Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Bubbewyth

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England


Events

DateEventTitle
14 May 1406AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
26 Sep 1406Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
22 Jun 1407AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
7 Oct 1407AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
27 Oct 1424DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Bubbewyth:
Bishop Nicholas Bubbewyth (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 311, and Page 130
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 435
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 140
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 294, and Page 601
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013