Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Wakefield

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Sep 1375AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 1375Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
11 Mar 1395DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Wakefield:
Bishop Henry Wakefield (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 59
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013