Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexander Neville

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Apr 1374AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
4 Jun 1374Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
30 Apr 1388ResignedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
30 Apr 1388AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
May 1392³DiedArchbishop Emeritus of York, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Alexander Neville:
Archbishop Alexander Neville Archbishop Emeritus of York

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 233
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 80
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013