Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict Nicholls

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1408AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
12 Aug 1408Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
15 Dec 1417AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
25 Jun 1433DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Benedict Nicholls:
Bishop Benedict Nicholls (died ) Bishop of Saint David’s

  • a bishop for 24.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 296, and Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 336, and Page 127
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 190
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013