Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentín García y Barros

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Thapsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1839Born
18 Apr 190767.6AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
15 Sep 190768.0Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
10 Dec 191475.3RetiredBishop of Palencia, Spain
10 Dec 191475.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
26 Aug 191677.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Valentín García y Barros
Bishop Valentín García y Barros (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuente Caldelas

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast