Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Gottfried Claessen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Gadara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1788³Born
14 Mar 181224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Jul 184456.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Jul 184456.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
19 Jan 184556.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
29 Sep 184759.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Gottfried Claessen
Bishop Anton Gottfried Claessen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGangelt, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,845, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast