Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Aranda Díaz-Muñoz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1933Born
28 Oct 195623.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 197541.7AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
24 Jun 197541.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
25 Nov 200673.4AppointedArchbishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
4 Jun 200874.9RetiredArchbishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
11 Nov 201885.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for Pedro Aranda Díaz-Muñoz
Archbishop Pedro Aranda Díaz-Muñoz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tulancingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón, Diocese of León, Guanajuato
Death PlaceTulancingo, Archdiocese of Tulancingo, Hidalgo

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2008
  • d: CB, 11 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast