Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Macchi

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1802BornMilano
12 Jun 182522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 May 182623.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 185956.7AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
26 May 186057.7Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
27 Mar 186764.5AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
22 May 187370.7DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Macchi:
Bishop Carlo Macchi (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 230, and Page 479
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013