Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Antici

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1631BornRecanati
6 Apr 165826.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 168553.7AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
23 Apr 168553.7Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
17 Jul 169059.0DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Antici:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Antici (born , died ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015