Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosendo Álvarez Gastón

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1926Born
22 Jul 195124.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 198458.2AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
12 Jan 198558.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
12 May 198962.7AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
15 Apr 200275.6RetiredBishop of Almería, Spain
3 Feb 201487.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rosendo Álvarez Gastón
Bishop Rosendo Álvarez Gastón (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMues

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • not d: CB, 6 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 3 Feb 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast