Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Yuhanna Boutros El-Hajj

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1817Born
26 Dec 183922.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 186143.7AppointedBishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon
15 Aug 186143.7Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Apr 189072.4SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
23 Jun 189072.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
24 Dec 189881.1DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Yuhanna Boutros El-Hajj
Patriarch Yuhanna Boutros El-Hajj (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelebte in Monte Libano

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 108
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017