Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nematalla Seluan

Deceased

Archbishop of Cipro (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1845¹Born
9 Feb 187025.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189247.4AppointedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
6 Dec 189247.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
18 Sep 190560.7DiedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nematalla Seluan:
Archbishop Nematalla Seluan (died ) Archbishop of Cipro

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013