Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Darian

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti

Titular See: (Egypt/Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1861Born
19 Jul 188826.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 189634.3AppointedPatriarchal Vicar
22 Mar 189634.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
22 Mar 189634.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
23 Mar 192058.3DiedPatriarchal Vicar

MicroData Summary for Joseph Darian
Archbishop Joseph Darian (born , died ) Patriarchal Vicar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscekut

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1896, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017