Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Massad

Deceased

Archbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1859Born
14 Dec 188930.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
14 Dec 188930.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
12 Jun 189233.4AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
Mar 1919³60.1DiedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Massad
Archbishop Paolo Massad (born , died Mar 1919) Archbishop of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHassrun

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017