Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youhanna Habib

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1816³Born
5 Apr 184124.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 188973.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazareth
14 Dec 188973.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nazareth
4 Jun 189477.6DiedTitular Bishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youhanna Habib
Bishop Youhanna Habib (born Oct 1816, died ) Titular Bishop of Nazareth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeit Eddine

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,794
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017