Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isidore Battikha, B.A.

Archbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1950 Born
1967²16.4ProfessedMember of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
11 Apr 198029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
25 Aug 199242.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
25 Aug 199242.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium dei Greco-Melkiti
10 Oct 199242.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pelusium dei Greco-Melkiti
9 Feb 200655.5AppointedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
6 Sep 201060.1ResignedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidore Battikha
Archbishop Isidore Battikha B.A. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,928
  • prof/c1: CB, 17 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jul 2017