Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacio José Gómez Aristizábal

Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe de Antioquia, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1929 Born
17 Aug 195828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón, Colombia
24 Jul 197242.6AppointedBishop of Ocańa, Colombia
8 Sep 197242.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ocańa, Colombia
10 Oct 199262.8AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe de Antioquia, Colombia
12 Jan 200777.1RetiredArchbishop of Santa Fe de Antioquia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ignacio José Gómez Aristizábal
Archbishop Ignacio José Gómez Aristizábal (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe de Antioquia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Peńol
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de Arma de Rionegro, Co-Cathedral, Sonsón-Rionegro, Diocese of Sonsón-Rionegro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast