Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Antonio López de Mesa

Deceased

Bishop of Antioquía, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1846Born
18 Jul 186923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
30 May 190256.0AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
9 Nov 190256.4Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
15 May 190861.9DiedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio López de Mesa
Bishop Manuel Antonio López de Mesa (born , died ) Bishop of Antioquía

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRionegro

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast