Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tarawa and Nauru

Dioecesis Taravana et Nauruna



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Simon Samendra Mani, M.S.C., Bishop-Elect

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 10 September 1982
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Suva
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Kiribati
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 832 (321 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Teaoraereke, P.O. Box 79, Bairiki, Tarawa, Kiribati
  • Telephone: 21.279; 730.37.770

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}
28 June 1897ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Micronesia Vicariate Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert} (erected)
Diocese of Tarawa
21 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert} Diocese of Tarawa
Diocese of Tarawa, Nauru and Funafuti
15 November 1978Name ChangedDiocese of Tarawa Diocese of Tarawa, Nauru and Funafuti
10 September 1982SplitDiocese of Tarawa, Nauru and Funafuti Mission "Sui Iuris" of Funafuti (Tuvalu)
Diocese of Tarawa and Nauru
Diocese of Tarawa and Nauru
10 September 1982SplitDiocese of Tarawa, Nauru and Funafuti Mission "Sui Iuris" of Funafuti (Tuvalu)
Diocese of Tarawa and Nauru

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tarawa
197024,92555,88744.6%52429859314418ap1971
Diocese of Tarawa, Nauru and Funafuti
198029,30056,21352.1%217191,542214722ap1981
Diocese of Tarawa and Nauru
199037,00072,00051.4%416201,850417124ap1991
199947,50188,60053.6%812202,3753378824ap2000
200049,00090,80054.0%811192,5783327325ap2001
200149,45691,45654.1%1214261,9023439224ap2002
200248,50091,00053.3%1417311,5646459024ap2003
200348,90892,49452.9%1412261,8812339924ap2004
200448,90892,49452.9%1311242,0372299725ap2005
201054,942110,36749.8%218291,8942229721ap2011
201463,644119,43553.3%197262,4473267115ap2015
201768,406126,63254.0%176232,974237321ap2018
202065,925127,70551.6%238312,126227324ap2021
202265,925127,70551.6%238312,126147324ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Tarawa
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 201, to Page 203
  • Diocese of Tarawa, Nauru and Funafuti
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 71, Page 382, and Page 383
  • Diocese of Tarawa and Nauru
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 75, Page 171, and Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 Jun 2024