Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Mérel, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Canton [Guangzhou], China

Titular Archbishop of Craina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1854Born
29 Jun 187924.7Ordained PriestPriest
1880¹25.2ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Apr 190146.5AppointedPrefect of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong), China
20 Apr 190146.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Orcistus
6 Oct 190147.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orcistus
6 Apr 191459.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou], China
4 Aug 191459.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou], China
16 Jun 192166.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Craina
13 Oct 193278.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Canton [Guangzhou], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Mérel
Bishop Jean-Marie Mérel M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Canton [Guangzhou]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePibordel, Diocese of Nantes, France
Ordained BishopCanton
Death PlaceSingapur

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 427
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 57
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast