Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Zinato

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1890Born
28 Jul 191322.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 194352.4AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
25 Jul 194352.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
11 Sep 197180.7RetiredBishop of Vicenza, Italy
23 Jun 197483.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Zinato (VIAF: 254718790)
Bishop Carlo Zinato (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSt. Marc, Basilica, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 45
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast