Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Longinus Żarnowiecki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Mosynopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1842Born
12 Mar 186623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
7 Apr 191068.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
7 Apr 191068.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
12 Jun 191068.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
5 Oct 191573.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Longinus Żarnowiecki (VIAF: 102201814)
Bishop Longinus Żarnowiecki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFolvarki
Ordained BishopSte. Catherine, Petersbourg

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 49
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,846

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast