Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Wilson

Archbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1968 Born
23 Feb 198516.6Converted
13 Jul 199426.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Leeds, England, Great Britain
29 Jul 199527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Leeds, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 201547.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 201547.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lindisfarna
25 Jan 201647.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lindisfarna
10 Jun 201950.9AppointedArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
25 Jul 201951.0InstalledArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Wilson
Archbishop John Wilson (born ) Archbishop of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSheffield, South Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Ordained DeaconOur Lady of the Snows, Church, Villa Palazzola, Rocca di Papa
Ordained PriestSacred Heart and St. Bernard, Church, Halifax, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Southwark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2015
  • od/ob/c012: CB, 24 Nov 2015
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,802
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2019
  • i: CL, 10 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast