Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Wanke

Bishop Emeritus of Erfurt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1941 Born
26 Jun 196625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
2 Oct 198039.4AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Administrator of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
2 Oct 198039.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Mauretania
26 Nov 198039.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum in Mauretania
17 Jan 198139.7SucceededApostolic Administrator of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
27 Jun 199453.1AppointedBishop of Erfurt, Germany
1 Oct 201271.4ResignedBishop of Erfurt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joachim Wanke
Bishop Joachim Wanke (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Erfurt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreslau, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Church, Erfurt, Apostolic Administration of Erfurt-Meiningen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Erfurt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,095

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast