Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Juan Vénnera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1911Born
11 Apr 193624.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 195644.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
22 May 195644.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abitinae
24 Aug 195645.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abitinae
21 Sep 195948.2AppointedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
19 Dec 195948.4InstalledBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
15 Feb 196654.6ResignedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
15 Feb 196654.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Iubaltiana
20 Dec 197059.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Iubaltiana
23 Jan 199078.5DiedBishop Emeritus of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Francisco Juan Vénnera
Bishop Francisco Juan Vénnera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Nicolás de los Arroyos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequito
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rosario, Diocese of Rosario

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 72
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,239
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast