Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillermo Bolatti

Deceased

Archbishop of Rosario, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1912Born
11 Apr 193623.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 195744.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2 Feb 195744.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
31 Mar 195744.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata
11 Jul 196148.9AppointedBishop of Rosario, Argentina
23 Sep 196149.1InstalledBishop of Rosario, Argentina
12 Aug 196351.0AppointedArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
7 Aug 198270.0DiedArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Bolatti
Archbishop Guillermo Bolatti (born , died ) Archbishop of Rosario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMackenna
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,639

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast