Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Víctor Iván Vargas Galarza

Auxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Bladia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1968 Born
10 May 199728.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cochabamba, Bolivia
24 Jun 202152.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
24 Jun 202152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
8 Sep 202152.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia

MicroData Summary for Víctor Iván Vargas Galarza
Bishop Víctor Iván Vargas Galarza (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCochabamba, Archdiocese of Cochabamba
Ordained BishopSan Sebastián, Cathedral, Cochabamba, Archdiocese of Cochabamba

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cochabamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2021
  • c12: CB, 25 Aug 2021
  • c3+: CB, 8 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Sep 2021

Quantcast