Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iñaki Mallona Txertudi, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arecibo, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1932Born
23 Jul 195018.0First VowsMember of Congregation of the Passion
3 Nov 195321.3Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Passion
27 Mar 195623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
14 Dec 199159.4AppointedBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
6 Jan 199259.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
25 Jan 199259.5InstalledBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
24 Sep 201078.2RetiredBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
3 May 202188.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Arecibo, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Iñaki Mallona Txertudi
Bishop Iñaki Mallona Txertudi C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arecibo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrúniz, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceHogar Irma Fe Pol, Lares

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,557
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • d/prof: CB, 3 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 May 2021

Quantcast