Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Traina

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1838Born
21 Sep 186123.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 190365.3AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
29 Jun 190365.3Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
18 Nov 191173.7DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Traina (VIAF: 305357781)
Bishop Francesco Maria Traina (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastronuovo di Sicilia

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Feb 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1903, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast