Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Torres Durán

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chitré, Panama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1937Born
16 Jul 196022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cali, Colombia
29 Nov 199659.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá
29 Nov 199659.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Abaradira
21 Dec 199659.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abaradira
2 Jul 199961.9AppointedBishop of Chitré, Panama
25 Apr 201375.7RetiredBishop of Chitré, Panama
13 Nov 201982.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Chitré, Panama

MicroData Summary for Fernando Torres Durán
Bishop Fernando Torres Durán (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chitré

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartago
Ordained BishopCathedral, Panamá, Archdiocese of Panamá
Death PlacePanama City, Archdiocese of Panamá

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,872
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2013
  • d: CB, 14 Nov 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast